MD HB1229 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-15 - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 11 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-15 - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring that the lessor of certain vehicles under a rental agreement or a loaner agreement containing a collision damage waiver provide the waiver in a specified form; requiring motor vehicle insurance policies that include collision or comprehensive coverage to include coverage for certain Class E vehicles, vehicles used as replacement vehicles, and vehicles rented under a peer-to-peer car sharing agreement; etc.
Title
Motor Vehicle Insurance - Comprehensive Coverage and Collision Damage Waiver
Sponsors
Del. Ned Carey [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-15 | House | Withdrawn by Sponsor |
2022-03-07 | House | Hearing canceled |
2022-02-14 | House | Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-02-11 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
Same As/Similar To
SB835 (Crossfiled) 2022-03-11 - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Subjects
Electronic Commerce
Forms
Insurance - Other than Health
Leases and Rent
Motor Vehicle Insurance
Motor Vehicles
Notices
Ridesharing
Forms
Insurance - Other than Health
Leases and Rent
Motor Vehicle Insurance
Motor Vehicles
Notices
Ridesharing
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Commercial Law | 14 | 2101 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Insurance | 19 | 512 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |