MD HB1208 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-04-04 - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Establishing the Board of Restorative Practices in Schools to study and analyze disciplinary policies and restorative practices in State public schools; providing for the composition, chair, and staffing of the Board; providing that the term of a selected member is 4 years; providing for staggered terms of selected members; requiring the Board to make recommendations regarding legislative and budgetary proposals for policies that reduce the school-to-prison pipeline and to report to the General Assembly by October 1 of each year; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Board of Restorative Practices in Schools - Establishment

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-13 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (113-26) (Y: 114 N: 27 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-04SenateUnfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2019-03-21SenateHearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-03-18SenateFirst Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2019-03-18HouseThird Reading Passed (113-26)
2019-03-15HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-03-15HouseSpecial Order until later this session (Delegate Haynes) Adopted
2019-03-15HouseFavorable with Amendments {545863/1 Report Adopted
2019-03-14HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
2019-02-12HouseHearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-02-08HouseFirst Reading Ways and Means

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback