MD HB1208 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-04 - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-04 - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing the Board of Restorative Practices in Schools to study and analyze disciplinary policies and restorative practices in State public schools; providing for the composition, chair, and staffing of the Board; providing that the term of a selected member is 4 years; providing for staggered terms of selected members; requiring the Board to make recommendations regarding legislative and budgetary proposals for policies that reduce the school-to-prison pipeline and to report to the General Assembly by October 1 of each year; etc.
Title
Board of Restorative Practices in Schools - Establishment
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-13 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (113-26) (Y: 114 N: 27 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-04 | Senate | Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-03-18 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2019-03-18 | House | Third Reading Passed (113-26) |
2019-03-15 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2019-03-15 | House | Special Order until later this session (Delegate Haynes) Adopted |
2019-03-15 | House | Favorable with Amendments {545863/1 Report Adopted |
2019-03-14 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means |
2019-02-12 | House | Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-02-08 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
Subjects
Budgets
Committees and Commissions
Communications
Data
Demographics
Discipline
Education
Examinations
Legislation
Primary and Secondary Education
Public Schools
Records
Reimbursement Rates
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Salaries and Compensation
Committees and Commissions
Communications
Data
Demographics
Discipline
Education
Examinations
Legislation
Primary and Secondary Education
Public Schools
Records
Reimbursement Rates
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Salaries and Compensation