MD HB12 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-15 - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-15 - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibiting a person from knowingly misrepresenting the person as a member or veteran of the United States armed forces or falsely holding the person out to be a recipient of a military award, in order to obtain a tangible benefit; and establishing a penalty of imprisonment not to exceed 9 months or a fine of not more than $10,000, or both, for a violation of the Act.
Title
Criminal Law - Impersonating a Member of the Military - Penalties
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-15 | House | Unfavorable Report by Judiciary |
2016-01-19 | House | Hearing 1/19 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-01-13 | House | First Reading Judiciary |
2015-10-28 | House | Pre-filed |
Subjects
Armed Forces
Crimes and Punishments
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes
Fines
Fraud
Penalties and Sentences
Veterans
Crimes and Punishments
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes
Fines
Fraud
Penalties and Sentences
Veterans