MD HB118 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 62
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 62
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibiting an insurer from canceling, refusing to renew, or otherwise terminating coverage for a private passenger motor vehicle insurance policy based on claims made under the policy's towing or emergency roadside coverage; authorizing an insurer to remove towing or emergency roadside service coverage from a certain policy at renewal based on the number of claims pursuant to the towing coverage; and authorizing an insurer to increase a premium of a private passenger motor vehicle insurance policy as a result of certain claims.
Title
Private Passenger Motor Vehicle Insurance - Prohibition on Cancellation Due to Towing or Emergency Roadside Coverage Claims
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-16 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 131 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 131 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-08 | House | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 62 |
2020-03-16 | House | Returned Passed |
2020-03-16 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2020-03-15 | Senate | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2020-03-15 | Senate | Favorable Report by Finance |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Referred Finance |
2020-02-05 | House | Third Reading Passed (131-0) |
2020-02-04 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2020-02-03 | House | Favorable Report by Economic Matters |
2020-01-22 | House | Hearing 1/30 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-01-13 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
Same As/Similar To
SB125 (Crossfiled) 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 63
Subjects
Agents and Brokers
Claims
Emergencies
Fees
Highways
Insurance - Other than Health
Motor Vehicle Insurance
Motor Vehicles
Towing
Claims
Emergencies
Fees
Highways
Insurance - Other than Health
Motor Vehicle Insurance
Motor Vehicles
Towing