MD HB1172 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-5)
Status: Engrossed on April 11 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-11 - Third Reading Passed (98-41)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 11 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-11 - Third Reading Passed (98-41)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing a specified insured to elect to obtain specified enhanced underinsured motorist coverage under a private passenger motor vehicle liability insurance policy; requiring specified insurers to offer an enhanced underinsured motorist coverage under specified circumstances; providing for the characteristics of the enhanced underinsured motorist coverage; applying the Act to each policy of private passenger motor vehicle insurance issued, sold, or delivered in the State on or after July 1, 2017; etc.
Title
Private Passenger Motor Vehicle Liability Insurance - Enhanced Underinsured Motorist Coverage
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-04-08 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (98-41) (Y: 98 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-11 | House | Third Reading Passed (98-41) |
2016-04-11 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2016-04-11 | House | Favorable with Amendments {393699/1 Report Adopted |
2016-04-11 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters |
2016-03-10 | House | Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-02-11 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
Subjects
Bonds
Claims
Committees and Commissions
Damages
Death
Health
Health Insurance
Health Maintenance Organizations
Insurance
Insurance - Other than Health
Liability
Marriage
Motor Vehicles
Names
Notices
Patients
Postal Service
Pregnancy
Registration
Securities
Sexual Orientation
Transportation
Vehicle Laws - Miscellaneous
Women
Workers' Compensation
Claims
Committees and Commissions
Damages
Death
Health
Health Insurance
Health Maintenance Organizations
Insurance
Insurance - Other than Health
Liability
Marriage
Motor Vehicles
Names
Notices
Patients
Postal Service
Pregnancy
Registration
Securities
Sexual Orientation
Transportation
Vehicle Laws - Miscellaneous
Women
Workers' Compensation