MD HB1171 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB705
Note: Carry Over of previous HB1031
Note: Carry Over of previous HB1031
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 11 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-22 - Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 11 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-22 - Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Proposing an amendment to the Maryland Constitution to establish that every person, as a central component of the individual's rights to liberty and equality, has the fundamental right to reproductive liberty; prohibiting the State from directly or indirectly denying, burdening, or abridging the right unless justified by a compelling State interest achieved by the least restrictive means; and submitting the amendment to the qualified voters of the State at the next general election to be held in November 2022.
Title
Declaration of Rights - Right to Reproductive Liberty
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-11 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 93 N: 42 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-03-09 - House - Floor Amendment 393820/1 (Delegate Wivell) Rejected (Y: 38 N: 86 NV: 11 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2022-03-09 - House - Floor Amendment 393820/1 (Delegate Wivell) Rejected (Y: 38 N: 86 NV: 11 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-22 | Senate | Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-03-14 | Senate | Referred Finance |
2022-03-11 | House | Third Reading Passed (93-42) |
2022-03-09 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2022-03-09 | House | Floor Amendment {393820/1 (Delegate Wivell) Rejected (38-86) |
2022-03-08 | House | Motion Special Order until 3/9 (Delegate Wivell) Adopted |
2022-03-08 | House | Favorable Adopted |
2022-03-07 | House | Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations |
2022-02-14 | House | Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-02-11 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
Same As/Similar To
HB1171 (Carry Over) 2022-03-22 - Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
HB1031 (Carry Over) 2019-03-04 - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
HB1031 (Carry Over) 2019-03-04 - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Subjects
Abortion
Constitutional Amendments
Declaration of Rights
Human Rights
Pregnancy
Public Health
Referendum
Reproductive Matters
Constitutional Amendments
Declaration of Rights
Human Rights
Pregnancy
Public Health
Referendum
Reproductive Matters
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Declaration of Rights | 48 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |