MD HB1031 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 53-0)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-04 - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Proposing an amendment to the Maryland Constitution to establish that the people have the right to bodily integrity and privacy to make personal decisions about childbearing and procreation without unwarranted government intrusion; and submitting the amendment to the qualified voters of the State for their adoption or rejection.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Declaration of Rights - Right of Bodily Integrity and Privacy

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-04HouseUnfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
2019-02-28HouseHearing canceled
2019-02-19HouseHearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-02-08HouseFirst Reading Health and Government Operations

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback