MD HB705 | 2023 | Regular Session

Note: Carry Over of previous HB1171

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 81-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-03 - Approved by the Governor, assigned a chapter number, enactment subject to constitutional referendum - Chapter 245
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Establishing that every person, as a central component of an individual's rights to liberty and equality, has the fundamental right to reproductive freedom; and prohibiting the State from, directly or indirectly, denying, burdening, or abridging the right unless justified by a compelling State interest achieved by the least restrictive means.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Declaration of Rights - Right to Reproductive Freedom

Sponsors

Del. Adrienne Jones [D]Del. Gabriel Acevero [D]Del. Jackie Addison [D]Del. Nick Allen [D]
Del. Tiffany Alston [D]Del. Vanessa Atterbeary [D]Del. Heather Bagnall [D]Del. Ben Barnes [D]
Del. Kumar Barve [D]Del. Adrian Boafo [D]Del. Regina Boyce [D]Del. Tony Bridges [D]
Del. Mark Chang [D]Del. Lorig Charkoudian [D]Sen. Nick Charles [D]Del. Luke Clippinger [D]
Del. Charlotte Crutchfield [D]Del. Bonnie Cullison [D]Del. Eric Ebersole [D]Del. Elizabeth Embry [D]
Del. Kris Fair [D]Del. Jessica Feldmark [D]Del. Linda Foley [D]Del. Catherine Forbes [D]
Del. David Fraser-hidalgo [D]Del. Brooke Grossman [D]Del. Michele Guyton [D]Del. Pam Guzzone [D]
Del. Kevin Harris [D]Del. Andrea Harrison [D]Del. Shaneka Henson [D]Del. Marvin Holmes [D]
Del. Andre Johnson [D]Del. Steve Johnson [D]Del. Dana Jones [D]Del. Anne Kaiser [D]
Del. Aaron Kaufman [D]Sen. Ariana Kelly [D]Del. Ken Kerr [D]Del. Marc Korman [D]
Del. Mary Lehman [D]Del. Jazz Lewis [D]Del. Robbyn Lewis [D]Del. Jeffrie Long [D]
Del. Lesley Lopez [D]Del. Sara Love [D]Del. Aletheia McCaskill [D]Del. Bernice Mireku-North [D]
Del. David Moon [D]Del. Julie Palakovich Carr [D]Del. Cheryl Pasteur [D]Del. Edith Patterson [D]
Del. Joseline Pena-Melnyk [D]Del. Scott Phillips [D]Del. Andrew Pruski [D]Del. Lily Qi [D]
Del. Pamela Queen [D]Del. Kirill Reznik [D]Del. Samuel Rosenberg [D]Del. Sheila Ruth [D]
Del. Sheree Sample-Hughes [D]Del. Emily Shetty [D]Del. Gary Simmons [D]Del. Karen Simpson [D]
Del. Stephanie Smith [D]Del. Jared Solomon [D]Del. Dana Stein [D]Del. Vaughn Stewart [D]
Del. Deni Taveras [D]Del. Jen Terrasa [D]Del. Karen Toles [D]Del. Veronica Turner [D]
Del. Kriselda Valderrama [D]Del. Joe Vogel [D]Del. Courtney Watson [D]Del. Melissa Wells [D]
Del. Jennifer White Holland [D]Del. Jheanelle Wilkins [D]Del. Nicole Williams [D]Del. C.T. Wilson [D]
Del. Natalie Ziegler [D]

Roll Calls

2023-03-31 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 33 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-31 - Senate - Floor Amendment 833328/1 (Senator Simonaire) Rejected (Y: 17 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2023-03-10 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 99 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-03-08 - House - Floor Amendment 913523/1 (Delegate Miller) Rejected (Y: 38 N: 97 NV: 3 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2023-03-08 - House - Floor Amendment 373529/1 (Delegate Wivell) Rejected (Y: 36 N: 99 NV: 3 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2023-03-08 - House - Floor Amendment 283723/1 (Delegate Wivell) Rejected (Y: 35 N: 96 NV: 7 Abs: 2) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-05-03HouseApproved by the Governor, assigned a chapter number, enactment subject to constitutional referendum - Chapter 245
2023-04-03HouseReturned Passed
2023-03-31SenateThird Reading Passed (33-14)
2023-03-31SenateFloor Amendment {833328/1 (Senator Simonaire) Rejected (17-30)
2023-03-29SenateSecond Reading Passed
2023-03-29SenateFavorable Adopted
2023-03-29SenateFavorable Report by Finance
2023-03-13SenateReferred Finance
2023-03-10HouseThird Reading Passed (99-37)
2023-03-08HouseSecond Reading Passed
2023-03-08HouseFloor Amendment {913523/1 (Delegate Miller) Rejected (38-97)
2023-03-08HouseFloor Amendment {373529/1 (Delegate Wivell) Rejected (36-99)
2023-03-08HouseFloor Amendment {283723/1 (Delegate Wivell) Rejected (35-96)
2023-03-07HouseMotion Special Order until 3/8 (Delegate Wivell) Adopted
2023-03-07HouseFavorable Adopted
2023-03-06HouseFavorable Report by Health and Government Operations
2023-02-15HouseHearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
2023-02-06HouseFirst Reading Health and Government Operations

Same As/Similar To

HB1171 (Carry Over) 2022-03-22 - Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
SB798 (Crossfiled) 2023-05-03 - Approved by the Governor, assigned a chapter number, enactment subject to constitutional referendum - Chapter 244

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Declaration of Rights48(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Legislation/Details/HB0705?ys=2023RS
Texthttps://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2023RS/bills/hb/hb0705f.pdf
Texthttps://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2023RS/bills/hb/hb0705t.pdf
Texthttps://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2023RS/Chapters_noln/CH_245_hb0705t.pdf
Amendmenthttps://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2023RS/amds/bil_0005/hb0705_91352301.pdf
Amendmenthttps://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2023RS/amds/bil_0005/hb0705_28372301.pdf
Amendmenthttps://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2023RS/amds/bil_0005/hb0705_37352901.pdf
Amendmenthttps://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2023RS/amds/bil_0005/hb0705_83332801.pdf
Supplementhttps://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2023RS/votes_comm/hb0705_hgo.pdf
Supplementhttps://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2023RS/votes_comm/hb0705_fin.pdf
Roll Callhttps://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2023RS/votes/House/0209.pdf
Roll Callhttps://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2023RS/votes/House/0210.pdf
Roll Callhttps://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2023RS/votes/House/0211.pdf
Roll Callhttps://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2023RS/votes/House/0290.pdf
Roll Callhttps://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2023RS/votes/Senate/0777.pdf
Roll Callhttps://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2023RS/votes/Senate/0778.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback