MD HB1103 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-20 - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-20 - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing the Task Force to Study Recycling and the Processing of Solid Waste to study recycling and the new technologies available for processing of municipal solid waste for purposes of reducing the amount of solid waste being landfilled; prohibiting a member of the Task Force from receiving certain compensation, but authorizing the reimbursement of certain expenses; requiring the Task Force to report its findings and recommendations to the Governor and the General Assembly on or before December 31, 2021; etc.
Title
Task Force to Study Recycling and the Processing of Solid Waste
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-20 | House | Withdrawn by Sponsor |
2021-02-07 | House | Hearing 2/24 at 1:30 p.m. |
2021-02-05 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
Subjects
Committees and Commissions
Environment
Environment, Department of the
Equipment
Examinations
Industry and Technology
Public Buildings and Facilities
Recycling
Refuse Disposal
Reports
Sunset
Environment
Environment, Department of the
Equipment
Examinations
Industry and Technology
Public Buildings and Facilities
Recycling
Refuse Disposal
Reports
Sunset