MD HB1075 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 17 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-03-17 - Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Repealing a prerequisite that a public school employee who is subject to a certain prohibited personnel action relating to an act of whistleblowing must exhaust any administrative remedies before instituting a civil action against a public school employer; requiring a public school employer to provide an administrative remedial process and to complete the process within 30 days after the employee files an initial complaint; requiring a public school employee to notify the superintendent of schools of any intent to file a civil action; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Public School Employees - Whistleblower Protection - Civil Actions

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-17 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 103 N: 30 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-17SenateReferred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2020-03-17HouseThird Reading Passed (103-30)
2020-03-15HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2020-03-15HouseFavorable with Amendments {635967/1 Adopted
2020-03-15HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
2020-02-11HouseHearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
2020-02-06HouseFirst Reading Ways and Means

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Education6901(n/a)See Bill Text
Education6902(n/a)See Bill Text
Education6903(n/a)See Bill Text
Education6904(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback