MD HB1073 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 16 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-16 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 664
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 16 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-16 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 664
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the Prince George's County Board of Education to develop curriculum content for a course in financial literacy to be offered to all students in the eighth grade; requiring specified curriculum content to include specified instruction; authorizing the county board to implement specified curriculum content in middle schools in Prince George's County beginning in the 2013-2014 school year; etc.
Title
Prince George's County Board of Education - Financial Literacy Curriculum PG 419-13
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-06 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-01 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (128-0) (Y: 128 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2013-04-01 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (128-0) (Y: 128 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-16 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 664 |
2013-04-08 | House | Returned Passed |
2013-04-08 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2013-04-08 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2013-04-08 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2013-04-08 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2013-04-08 | Senate | Hearing 4/08 at 3:45 p.m. |
2013-04-08 | Senate | Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2013-04-08 | Senate | First Reading Senate Rules |
2013-04-06 | House | Third Reading Passed (128-0) |
2013-04-05 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2013-04-05 | House | Favorable with Amendments {215562/1 Report Adopted |
2013-04-05 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means |
2013-03-13 | House | Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m. |
2013-02-08 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
Subjects
Consumer Protection
Education
Education - Local Bills
Education, Boards of
Prince George's County
Public Schools
Students
Education
Education - Local Bills
Education, Boards of
Prince George's County
Public Schools
Students