MD HB1064 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on May 9 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-09 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 416
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on May 9 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-09 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 416
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Allowing a subtraction under the Maryland income tax for the payment of a death benefit under a collective bargaining agreement to a spouse or beneficiary of a law enforcement officer or fire fighter whose death arises out of the course of employment; and applying the Act retroactively to taxable years beginning after December 31, 2021.
Title
Income Tax Subtraction Modification – Death Benefits – Law Enforcement Officers and Fire Fighters
Sponsors
Del. Wayne Hartman [R] | Del. Christopher Adams [R] | Del. Carl Anderton [R] | Del. Tom Hutchinson [R] |
Del. Charles Otto [R] | Del. Sheree Sample-Hughes [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-04-05 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 132 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2024-04-03 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-15 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 135 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-04-03 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-15 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 135 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-09 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 416 |
2024-04-05 | House | Passed Enrolled |
2024-04-05 | House | Third Reading Passed (132-0) |
2024-04-05 | House | House Concurs Senate Amendments |
2024-04-03 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2024-04-03 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2024-04-03 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {443220/1 Adopted |
2024-04-03 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation |
2024-03-18 | Senate | Referred Budget and Taxation |
2024-03-15 | House | Third Reading Passed (135-0) |
2024-03-14 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2024-03-13 | House | Favorable Report by Ways and Means |
2024-02-07 | House | Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m. |
2024-02-07 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
Same As/Similar To
SB897 (Crossfiled) 2024-05-09 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 417
Subjects
Beneficiaries
Collective Bargaining
Counties
Death
Emergency Bills
Exemptions
Fire Protection
Income Tax
Law Enforcement
Municipal Corporations
Spouses
Taxes - Income
Collective Bargaining
Counties
Death
Emergency Bills
Exemptions
Fire Protection
Income Tax
Law Enforcement
Municipal Corporations
Spouses
Taxes - Income
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Tax - General | 10 | 207 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |