MD HB1050 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-04 - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-04 - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing a person that plants barley, rye, or wheat cover crops as a certain best management practice to sell the harvested cover crop to a certain person that holds a certain alcoholic beverages license and will process the cover crop in the State.
Title
Agriculture - Cost-Sharing Program - Sale of Harvested Cover Crops
Sponsors
Del. Ken Kerr [D] | Del. Ben Barnes [D] | Del. Jason Buckel [R] | Del. Alfred Carr [D] |
Del. Barrie Ciliberti [R] | Del. Dan Cox [R] | Del. Brian Crosby [D] | Del. Michele Guyton [D] |
Del. Kevin Hornberger [R] | Del. Julian Ivey [D] | Del. Susan Krebs [R] | Del. Carol Krimm [D] |
Del. David Moon [D] | Del. Edith Patterson [D] | Del. Jesse Pippy [R] | Del. Teresa Reilly [R] |
Del. April Rose [R] | Del. Vaughn Stewart [D] | Del. Pat Young [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-04 | House | Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn |
2019-02-26 | House | Hearing canceled |
2019-02-11 | House | Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-02-08 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
Subjects
Agriculture
Alcoholic Beverages - Statewide Bills
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Alcoholic Beverages Manufacturing
Commerce and Business
Environment
Industry and Technology
Prices
Alcoholic Beverages - Statewide Bills
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Alcoholic Beverages Manufacturing
Commerce and Business
Environment
Industry and Technology
Prices