MD HB1050 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 8 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-04 - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Authorizing a person that plants barley, rye, or wheat cover crops as a certain best management practice to sell the harvested cover crop to a certain person that holds a certain alcoholic beverages license and will process the cover crop in the State.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Agriculture - Cost-Sharing Program - Sale of Harvested Cover Crops

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-04HouseUnfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
2019-02-26HouseHearing canceled
2019-02-11HouseHearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-02-08HouseFirst Reading Environment and Transportation

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback