MD HB1017 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on April 5 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-05 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 24
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring the Department of Budget and Management, University System of Maryland system institutions, Morgan State University, St. Mary's College of Maryland, and Baltimore City Community College to provide certain information on certain employees to certain exclusive representatives within 30 days of a new employee's date of hire; requiring an exclusive representative to withhold certain communication with an employee on the written request of the employee with certain exceptions; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

State Personnel – Collective Bargaining – Exclusive Representative Access to New Employee Program

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-22 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (33-14) (Y: 34 N: 15 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-03-21 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (90-49) (Y: 91 N: 50 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2018-03-21 - Senate - Senate Floor - Floor Amendment {253624/1 (Senator Cassilly) Rejected (15-30) (Y: 16 N: 31 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2018-03-21 - Senate - Senate Floor - Floor Amendment {373422/1 (Senator Hershey) Rejected (14-31) (Y: 15 N: 32 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2018-03-21 - Senate - Senate Floor - Floor Amendment {283524/1 (Senator Middleton) Adopted (45-0) (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-03-21 - Senate - Senate Floor - Floor Amendment {413823/1 (Senator Jennings) Rejected (14-31) (Y: 15 N: 32 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [FAIL]
2018-03-21 - Senate - Senate Floor - Floor Amendment {463421/1 (Senator Hershey) Rejected (15-30) (Y: 16 N: 31 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2018-03-12 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (87-48) (Y: 88 N: 49 NV: 2 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2018-03-11 - House - House Floor - Floor Amendment {653024/1 (Delegate Krebs) Rejected (47-87) (Y: 48 N: 88 NV: 5 Abs: 8) [FAIL]
2018-03-11 - House - House Floor - Floor Amendment {513427/1 (Delegate Krebs) Rejected (47-86) (Y: 48 N: 87 NV: 6 Abs: 8) [FAIL]
2018-03-11 - House - House Floor - Floor Amendment {203220/1 (Delegate Shoemaker) Rejected (47-87) (Y: 48 N: 88 NV: 5 Abs: 8) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-05HouseEnacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 24
2018-03-28HousePassed Enrolled
2018-03-28HouseThird Reading Passed (90-49)
2018-03-28HouseHouse Concur - Senate Amendments
2018-03-26SenateThird Reading Passed with Amendments (33-14)
2018-03-23SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2018-03-23SenateFloor Amendment {463421/1 (Senator Hershey) Rejected (15-30)
2018-03-23SenateFloor Amendment {413823/1 (Senator Jennings) Rejected (14-31)
2018-03-23SenateFloor Amendment {253624/1 (Senator Cassilly) Rejected (15-30)
2018-03-23SenateFloor Amendment {373422/1 (Senator Hershey) Rejected (14-31)
2018-03-23SenateFloor Amendment {283524/1 (Senator Middleton) Adopted (45-0)
2018-03-22SenateSpecial Order until 3/23 (Senator Hershey) Adopted
2018-03-22SenateFavorable Report Adopted
2018-03-22SenateFavorable Report by Finance
2018-03-16SenateFirst Reading Finance
2018-03-15HouseThird Reading Passed (87-48)
2018-03-14HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2018-03-14HouseFloor Amendment {203220/1 (Delegate Shoemaker) Rejected (47-87)
2018-03-14HouseFloor Amendment {513427/1 (Delegate Krebs) Rejected (47-86)
2018-03-14HouseFloor Amendment {653024/1 (Delegate Krebs) Rejected (47-87)
2018-03-14HouseFloor Amendment {353722/1 (Delegate Krebs) Adopted
2018-03-13HouseSpecial Order until next session (Delegate Shoemaker) Adopted
2018-03-13HouseFavorable with Amendments {994869/1 Report Adopted
2018-03-12HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
2018-02-23HouseHearing 2/23 at 2:00 p.m.
2018-02-07HouseFirst Reading Appropriations

Subjects


Maryland State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?id=hb1017&stab=01&pid=billpage&tab=subject3&ys=2018rs
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/bills/hb/hb1017f.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/bills/hb/hb1017t.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/bills/hb/hb1017e.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/Chapters_noln/CH_24_hb1017e.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2018RS/amds/bil_0007/hb1017_99486901.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2018RS/amds/bil_0007/hb1017_20322001.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2018RS/amds/bil_0007/hb1017_35372201.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2018RS/amds/bil_0007/hb1017_51342701.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2018RS/amds/bil_0007/hb1017_65302401.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2018RS/amds/bil_0007/hb1017_25362401.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2018RS/amds/bil_0007/hb1017_28352401.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2018RS/amds/bil_0007/hb1017_37342201.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2018RS/amds/bil_0007/hb1017_41382301.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2018RS/amds/bil_0007/hb1017_46342101.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/fnotes/bil_0007/hb1017.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes_comm/hb1017_app.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes/House/0387.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes/House/0388.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes/House/0389.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes/House/0468.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes_comm/hb1017_fin.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes/Senate/0785.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes/Senate/0786.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes/Senate/0787.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes/Senate/0788.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes/Senate/0789.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes/Senate/0826.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes/House/0913.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback