MA S94 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2624
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-01-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2624
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-01-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2624
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to establish a low vision registry. Children, Families and Persons with Disabilities.
Title
Establishing a low vision registry
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-26 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2624 |
2021-11-02 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 11/15/2021 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | House | House concurred |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Children, Families and Persons with Disabilities |
Same As/Similar To
H278 (Similar To) 2022-07-11 - Accompanied a study order, see H4909
S2540 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S1421 (Similar To) 2022-03-17 - Accompanied a study order, see S2772
S2348 (Similar To) 2022-01-24 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2282 (Similar To) 2021-09-27 - Amendment #1 () adopted
S449 (Similar To) 2022-09-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5026
S2624 (Replaced by) 2022-02-03 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
S2540 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S1421 (Similar To) 2022-03-17 - Accompanied a study order, see S2772
S2348 (Similar To) 2022-01-24 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2282 (Similar To) 2021-09-27 - Amendment #1 () adopted
S449 (Similar To) 2022-09-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5026
S2624 (Replaced by) 2022-02-03 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S94 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S94.pdf |