MA S934 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-10 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-10 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to indigency. The Judiciary.
Title
Related to indigency
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-10 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Accompanied by H1673 |
2021-10-21 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/29/2021 from 10:00 AM-03:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | House | House concurred |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on The Judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
H1673 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied S934
S97 (Similar To) 2022-01-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2624
S888 (Similar To) 2022-09-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5276
S97 (Similar To) 2022-01-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2624
S888 (Similar To) 2022-09-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5276
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S934 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S934.pdf |