MA S933 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2313
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-01 - Accompanied a study order, see S2313
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-01 - Accompanied a study order, see S2313
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to health care proxies. The Judiciary.
Title
Relative to health care proxies
Sponsors
Sen. Richard Ross [R] | Sen. Bruce Tarr [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-01 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2313 |
2017-05-01 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 05/08/2017 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1 & A-2 |
2017-01-23 | House | House concurred |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on The Judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
S609 (Similar To) 2018-05-29 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S600 (Similar To) 2018-03-15 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S551 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2496
S1193 (Similar To) 2018-04-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2422
S1194 (Similar To) 2018-04-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2422
H2216 (Similar To) 2018-05-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4528
S630 (Similar To) 2018-05-31 - Accompanied a study order, see S2535
H1007 (Similar To) 2018-04-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4418
H607 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H2468 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H2343 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
S508 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2496
H530 (Similar To) 2018-07-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4778
H3822 (Similar To) 2017-08-01 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 63 of the Acts of 2017
S2313 (Replaced by) 2018-03-29 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
H4639 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Committee of conference appointed (Welch-Lewis-Tarr), in concurrence
S600 (Similar To) 2018-03-15 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S551 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2496
S1193 (Similar To) 2018-04-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2422
S1194 (Similar To) 2018-04-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2422
H2216 (Similar To) 2018-05-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4528
S630 (Similar To) 2018-05-31 - Accompanied a study order, see S2535
H1007 (Similar To) 2018-04-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4418
H607 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H2468 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H2343 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
S508 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2496
H530 (Similar To) 2018-07-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4778
H3822 (Similar To) 2017-08-01 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 63 of the Acts of 2017
S2313 (Replaced by) 2018-03-29 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
H4639 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Committee of conference appointed (Welch-Lewis-Tarr), in concurrence
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S933 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S933.pdf |