MA S915 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2665
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2665
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2665
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to ensure an open files policy. The Judiciary.
Title
Ensuring an open files policy
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-07 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2665 |
2021-10-06 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/12/2021 from 10:00 AM-03:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | House | House concurred |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on The Judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
H1271 (Similar To) 2022-10-13 - Accompanied a study order, see H5201
S192 (Similar To) 2021-11-04 - Accompanied S211
S765 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see S2917
S2519 (Similar To) 2021-09-02 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H4120 (Similar To) 2022-09-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H5219
H1749 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4844
S806 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see S2917
S357 (Similar To) 2022-03-10 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2749
H865 (Similar To) 2022-08-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H5041
S1304 (Similar To) 2022-09-08 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S7 (Similar To) 2021-01-19 - Placed on file
S13 (Similar To) 2021-02-08 - See S9
S1346 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S2665 (Replaced by) 2022-02-10 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
H4954 (Similar To) 2022-07-25 - Reported by H5090
S812 (Similar To) 2021-11-15 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4248
S9 (Similar To) 2021-03-26 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 8 of the Acts of 2021
S192 (Similar To) 2021-11-04 - Accompanied S211
S765 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see S2917
S2519 (Similar To) 2021-09-02 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H4120 (Similar To) 2022-09-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H5219
H1749 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4844
S806 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see S2917
S357 (Similar To) 2022-03-10 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2749
H865 (Similar To) 2022-08-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H5041
S1304 (Similar To) 2022-09-08 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S7 (Similar To) 2021-01-19 - Placed on file
S13 (Similar To) 2021-02-08 - See S9
S1346 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S2665 (Replaced by) 2022-02-10 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
H4954 (Similar To) 2022-07-25 - Reported by H5090
S812 (Similar To) 2021-11-15 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4248
S9 (Similar To) 2021-03-26 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 8 of the Acts of 2021
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S915 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S915.pdf |