MA S900 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-18 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation relative to electronic meetings and voting in condominiums. Housing.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to electronic meetings and voting in condominiums

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2024-03-18SenateBill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
2023-10-16JointHearing scheduled for 10/24/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1
2023-02-16HouseHouse concurred
2023-02-16SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Housing

Same As/Similar To

S1759 (Similar To) 2024-04-22 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H1338 (Similar To) 2024-07-08 - Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
H1346 (Similar To) 2024-07-11 - Amendment (changing reporting date to Wednesday July 31, 2024) adopted, pending concurrence
H2892 (Similar To) 2024-04-22 - Read second and ordered to a third reading

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback