MA S899 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4005
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on April 15 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-16 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4005
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 15 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-16 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4005
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to prohibit solicitation of a felony. The Judiciary.
Title
Prohibiting solicitation of a felony
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-16 | House | Accompanied a new draft, see H4005 |
2015-07-14 | Joint | Hearing rescheduled to 07/14/2015 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium |
2015-07-01 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/14/2015 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2 |
2015-04-15 | House | House concurred |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on The Judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
H4005 (Replaced by) 2016-07-07 - Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1086 (Similar To) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2385
S1712 (Similar To) 2016-05-25 - Read second, amended and ordered to a third reading
S1005 (Similar To) 2015-10-19 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S896 (Similar To) 2016-04-04 - Accompanied a study order, see S2204
S1086 (Similar To) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2385
S1712 (Similar To) 2016-05-25 - Read second, amended and ordered to a third reading
S1005 (Similar To) 2015-10-19 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S896 (Similar To) 2016-04-04 - Accompanied a study order, see S2204
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/S899 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/S899.pdf |