MA S1086 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2385
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 15 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2385
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 15 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2385
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to prohibiting the use or sale of polystyrene packaging. Municipalities and Regional Government.
Title
Authorizing cities and towns to prohibit the sale or use of polystyrene packaging
Sponsors
Sen. Brian Joyce [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-07-05 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2385 |
2015-12-03 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 12/10/2015 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in B-2 |
2015-04-15 | House | House concurred |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Municipalities and Regional Government |
Same As/Similar To
S2385 (Replaced by) 2016-07-08 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
S1034 (Similar To) 2016-05-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4272
S953 (Similar To) 2015-04-23 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S434 (Similar To) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2380
S435 (Similar To) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2380
S436 (Similar To) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2380
S899 (Similar To) 2016-02-16 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4005
H2087 (Similar To) 2016-09-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H4611
S369 (Similar To) 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2316
S370 (Similar To) 2016-09-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4620
S1034 (Similar To) 2016-05-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4272
S953 (Similar To) 2015-04-23 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S434 (Similar To) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2380
S435 (Similar To) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2380
S436 (Similar To) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2380
S899 (Similar To) 2016-02-16 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4005
H2087 (Similar To) 2016-09-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H4611
S369 (Similar To) 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2316
S370 (Similar To) 2016-09-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4620
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/S1086 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/S1086.pdf |