MA S896 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2204
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 15 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-04 - Accompanied a study order, see S2204
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 15 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-04 - Accompanied a study order, see S2204
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to due process to prohibit the Commonwealth and its political subdivisions from adopting environmental and developmental policies that would infringe or restrict private property rights. The Judiciary.
Title
Relative to due process to prohibit the Commonwealth and its political subdivisions from adopting environmental and developmental policies that would infringe or restrict private property rights
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-04 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2204 |
2015-05-06 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 05/12/2015 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2 |
2015-04-15 | House | House concurred |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on The Judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
S2204 (Replaced by) 2016-06-13 - Reported (in part) by S812
S790 (Similar To) 2016-04-04 - Accompanied a study order, see S2204
S473 (Similar To) 2016-01-25 - Bill reported favorably by committee as changed and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1860 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2364
H1272 (Similar To) 2016-10-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
H1558 (Similar To) 2016-10-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
H1557 (Similar To) 2016-02-16 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4005
S790 (Similar To) 2016-04-04 - Accompanied a study order, see S2204
S473 (Similar To) 2016-01-25 - Bill reported favorably by committee as changed and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1860 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2364
H1272 (Similar To) 2016-10-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
H1558 (Similar To) 2016-10-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
H1557 (Similar To) 2016-02-16 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4005
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/S896 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/S896.pdf |