MA S790 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2204
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on April 15 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-04 - Accompanied a study order, see S2204
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 15 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-04 - Accompanied a study order, see S2204
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to include certain compounds in the classification of controlled substances. The Judiciary.
Title
Relative to controlled substances
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-04 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2204 |
2015-10-07 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/14/2015 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1 |
2015-04-15 | House | House concurred |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on The Judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
S2204 (Replaced by) 2016-06-13 - Reported (in part) by S812
H1284 (Similar To) 2015-06-22 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3611
S894 (Similar To) 2016-04-04 - Accompanied a study order, see S2204
S1399 (Similar To) 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2314
S917 (Similar To) 2016-04-04 - Accompanied a study order, see S2204
S1055 (Similar To) 2016-05-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4272
S1807 (Similar To) 2016-05-19 - Accompanied H3073
S1331 (Similar To) 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2314
S873 (Similar To) 2016-04-04 - Accompanied a study order, see S2204
S1668 (Similar To) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2386
H1284 (Similar To) 2015-06-22 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3611
S894 (Similar To) 2016-04-04 - Accompanied a study order, see S2204
S1399 (Similar To) 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2314
S917 (Similar To) 2016-04-04 - Accompanied a study order, see S2204
S1055 (Similar To) 2016-05-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4272
S1807 (Similar To) 2016-05-19 - Accompanied H3073
S1331 (Similar To) 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2314
S873 (Similar To) 2016-04-04 - Accompanied a study order, see S2204
S1668 (Similar To) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2386
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/S790 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/S790.pdf |