MA S1860 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2364
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 15 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2364
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 15 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2364
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to enhance public safety by providing implied consent in cases of persons operating under the influence of drugs. Transportation.
Title
To enhance public safety by providing implied consent in cases of persons operating under the influence of drugs
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-23 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2364 |
2015-07-09 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/15/2015 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in A-1 |
2015-04-15 | House | House concurred |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Transportation |
Same As/Similar To
S2364 (Replaced by) 2016-06-27 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
S2014 (Similar To) 2015-09-24 - Passed to be engrossed - see Roll Call #164 (YEAS 38 - NAYS 0)
S1766 (Similar To) 2016-03-07 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S739 (Similar To) 2016-04-04 - Accompanied a study order, see S2204
S1261 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2362
S773 (Similar To) 2016-04-04 - Accompanied a study order, see S2204
S463 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2356
S1903 (Similar To) 2016-03-10 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1812 (Similar To) 2015-09-24 - New draft substituted, as amended, see S2014
S1161 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2356
S1038 (Similar To) 2016-05-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4272
S710 (Similar To) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2383
S473 (Similar To) 2016-01-25 - Bill reported favorably by committee as changed and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S471 (Similar To) 2015-07-01 - Accompanied a new draft, see S1956
S2014 (Similar To) 2015-09-24 - Passed to be engrossed - see Roll Call #164 (YEAS 38 - NAYS 0)
S1766 (Similar To) 2016-03-07 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S739 (Similar To) 2016-04-04 - Accompanied a study order, see S2204
S1261 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2362
S773 (Similar To) 2016-04-04 - Accompanied a study order, see S2204
S463 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2356
S1903 (Similar To) 2016-03-10 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1812 (Similar To) 2015-09-24 - New draft substituted, as amended, see S2014
S1161 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2356
S1038 (Similar To) 2016-05-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4272
S710 (Similar To) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2383
S473 (Similar To) 2016-01-25 - Bill reported favorably by committee as changed and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S471 (Similar To) 2015-07-01 - Accompanied a new draft, see S1956
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/S1860 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/S1860.pdf |