MA S872 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-17 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-17 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to leverage additional resources for local housing authorities. Housing.
Title
Leveraging additional resources for local housing authorities
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-17 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2022-03-17 | Senate | Accompanied by H1439 |
2021-09-01 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/15/2021 from 11:00 AM-03:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | House | House concurred |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Housing |
Same As/Similar To
H1439 (Similar To) 2022-03-17 - Accompanied S872
H3809 (Similar To) 2021-12-01 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 97 of the Acts of 2021
S2473 (Similar To) 2022-08-08 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S2484 (Similar To) 2022-10-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5250
H4059 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H1376 (Similar To) 2022-04-28 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4686
S2233 (Similar To) 2022-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2715
H3722 (Similar To) 2022-06-02 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 73 of the Acts of 2022
S905 (Similar To) 2022-09-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5276
S1613 (Similar To) 2022-03-21 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S371 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2755
S1860 (Similar To) 2022-10-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5250
S878 (Similar To) 2022-09-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5276
S879 (Similar To) 2022-09-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5276
S882 (Similar To) 2022-09-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5276
H4916 (Similar To) 2022-07-31 - Reported by H5151
S871 (Similar To) 2022-03-07 - Accompanied H1448
H3809 (Similar To) 2021-12-01 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 97 of the Acts of 2021
S2473 (Similar To) 2022-08-08 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S2484 (Similar To) 2022-10-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5250
H4059 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H1376 (Similar To) 2022-04-28 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4686
S2233 (Similar To) 2022-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2715
H3722 (Similar To) 2022-06-02 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 73 of the Acts of 2022
S905 (Similar To) 2022-09-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5276
S1613 (Similar To) 2022-03-21 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S371 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2755
S1860 (Similar To) 2022-10-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5250
S878 (Similar To) 2022-09-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5276
S879 (Similar To) 2022-09-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5276
S882 (Similar To) 2022-09-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5276
H4916 (Similar To) 2022-07-31 - Reported by H5151
S871 (Similar To) 2022-03-07 - Accompanied H1448
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S872 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S872.pdf |