MA S862 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H5276
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-09-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5276
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-09-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5276
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to the use of community preservation funding by local public housing authorities. Housing.
Title
Relative to local public housing authorities
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-09-19 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H5276 |
2021-09-01 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/15/2021 from 11:00 AM-03:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | House | House concurred |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Housing |
Same As/Similar To
S878 (Similar To) 2022-09-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5276
S883 (Similar To) 2022-09-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5276
S1419 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2692
S906 (Similar To) 2022-09-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5276
H5276 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S883 (Similar To) 2022-09-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5276
S1419 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2692
S906 (Similar To) 2022-09-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5276
H5276 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S862 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S862.pdf |