MA S862 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2313
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-01 - Accompanied a study order, see S2313
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-01 - Accompanied a study order, see S2313
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to improve training for child advocates to recognize indictors of domestic violence. The Judiciary.
Title
Relative to improving training for child advocates to recognize indicators of domestic violence
Sponsors
Sen. Linda Forry [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-01 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2313 |
2017-05-01 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 05/15/2017 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1 & A-2 |
2017-01-23 | House | House concurred |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on The Judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
S1360 (Similar To) 2018-07-18 - Accompanied S1380
S1153 (Similar To) 2018-01-29 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1328 (Similar To) 2018-01-29 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1241 (Similar To) 2018-06-21 - New draft substituted, see S2567
S1223 (Similar To) 2018-05-31 - Accompanied a study order, see S2535
S1371 (Similar To) 2018-01-26 - Accompanied S1328
S1054 (Similar To) 2018-03-22 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H1037 (Similar To) 2018-04-09 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4386
H1168 (Similar To) 2017-05-30 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3719
H1456 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
H889 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
S2109 (Similar To) 2017-10-26 - New draft substituted, see S2192
S2257 (Similar To) 2018-01-25 - Referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2297 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
S2313 (Replaced by) 2018-03-29 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
H4321 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4438
H4808 (Similar To) 2018-08-06 - Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1153 (Similar To) 2018-01-29 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1328 (Similar To) 2018-01-29 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1241 (Similar To) 2018-06-21 - New draft substituted, see S2567
S1223 (Similar To) 2018-05-31 - Accompanied a study order, see S2535
S1371 (Similar To) 2018-01-26 - Accompanied S1328
S1054 (Similar To) 2018-03-22 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H1037 (Similar To) 2018-04-09 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4386
H1168 (Similar To) 2017-05-30 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3719
H1456 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
H889 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
S2109 (Similar To) 2017-10-26 - New draft substituted, see S2192
S2257 (Similar To) 2018-01-25 - Referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2297 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
S2313 (Replaced by) 2018-03-29 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
H4321 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4438
H4808 (Similar To) 2018-08-06 - Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S862 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S862.pdf |