MA S2297 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Engrossed on February 14 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 14 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Expanding the community college training incentive program
Title
Expanding the community college training incentive program
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2018-02-14 - Senate - Senate Passed to be engrossed Roll Call #326 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-01 | House | No further action taken |
2018-02-15 | House | Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Passed to be engrossed -see Roll Call #326 (Yeas 35 to Nays 0) |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Read third |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Amendment #1 (Tarr) adopted |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Substituted for S676 |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Recommended new draft for S676 |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Reported from the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
Same As/Similar To
S676 (Similar To) 2018-02-14 - New draft substituted, see S2297
S675 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2487
S675 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2487
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S2297 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S2297.pdf |
Roll Call | https://malegislature.gov/RollCall/190/SenateRollCall326.pdf |