MA S2257 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Replaces legislation S274
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Introduced on January 25 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-25 - Referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-25 - Referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to promote local control and effective training of school resource officers,- reports the accompanying bill (Senate, No. 2257).
Title
Promoting local control and effective training of school resource officers
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-25 | Senate | Referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2018-01-25 | Senate | New draft of S274 |
2018-01-25 | Senate | Reported from the committee on Education |
Same As/Similar To
S274 (Replaces) 2018-01-25 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2257
S2109 (Similar To) 2017-10-26 - New draft substituted, see S2192
H1168 (Similar To) 2017-05-30 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3719
S1371 (Similar To) 2018-01-26 - Accompanied S1328
H1456 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
S1153 (Similar To) 2018-01-29 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2297 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H4321 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4438
S1054 (Similar To) 2018-03-22 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2109 (Similar To) 2017-10-26 - New draft substituted, see S2192
H1168 (Similar To) 2017-05-30 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3719
S1371 (Similar To) 2018-01-26 - Accompanied S1328
H1456 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
S1153 (Similar To) 2018-01-29 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2297 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H4321 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4438
S1054 (Similar To) 2018-03-22 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S2257 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S2257.pdf |