MA S847 | 2013-2014 | 188th General Court
Note: Replaces legislation H1712
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-01-06 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-01-06 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to econmically stabilize displaced service workers. Labor and Workforce Development.
Title
Relative to economic stability for displaced service workers
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-01-06 | Senate | No further action taken |
2013-11-14 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2013-11-14 | Senate | Accompanied by H1712 |
2013-07-24 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/10/2013 from 10:00 AM-03:00 PM in B-1 |
2013-01-22 | House | House concurred |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Referred to the Senate Committee on Labor and Workforce Development |
Same As/Similar To
H1712 (Replaces) 2013-11-14 - Accompanied S847
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/188/Senate/S847 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Document/Bill/188/Senate/S847.pdf |