MA S844 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2491
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-12 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2491
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-12 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2491
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to update the definition of sexual assault counsellor to expand confidentiality protections. The Judiciary.
Title
Updating the definition of sexual assault counsellor to expand confidentiality protections
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-12 | Senate | Accompanied a new draft, see S2491 |
2019-11-25 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 12/03/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1 |
2019-01-22 | House | House concurred |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on The Judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
S137 (Similar To) 2020-04-30 - Accompanied S125
H3427 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H1912 (Similar To) 2020-02-26 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4446
S736 (Similar To) 2020-03-05 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2580
S764 (Similar To) 2020-03-05 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2580
S1307 (Similar To) 2020-05-11 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2692
H1026 (Similar To) 2020-12-01 - Accompanied a study order, see H5160
S2491 (Replaced by) 2020-03-12 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
H3427 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H1912 (Similar To) 2020-02-26 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4446
S736 (Similar To) 2020-03-05 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2580
S764 (Similar To) 2020-03-05 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2580
S1307 (Similar To) 2020-05-11 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2692
H1026 (Similar To) 2020-12-01 - Accompanied a study order, see H5160
S2491 (Replaced by) 2020-03-12 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S844 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S844.pdf |