MA S764 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by S2580

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 31-8)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-03-05 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2580
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation relative to sexual violence on higher education campuses. Higher Education.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to sexual violence on higher education campuses

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-05SenateAccompanied a new draft, see S2580
2019-03-19JointHearing scheduled for 04/09/2019 from 10:30 AM-01:00 PM in A-1
2019-01-22HouseHouse concurred
2019-01-22SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Higher Education

Same As/Similar To

H481 (Similar To) 2020-04-23 - Reporting date extended to Friday November 20, 2020, pending concurrence
H1208 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4418
H8 (Similar To) 2019-09-18 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4075
H1241 (Similar To) 2019-05-23 - Hearing scheduled for 06/11/2019 from 10:30 AM-01:30 PM in A-1
H1219 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4419
S750 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2541
S739 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2541
S740 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2541
S755 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2541
S768 (Similar To) 2020-03-05 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1471 (Similar To) 2019-10-24 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S751 (Similar To) 2020-04-09 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2183 (Similar To) 2019-09-18 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4075
H4177 (Similar To) 2019-11-12 - Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2580 (Replaced by) 2020-03-05 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback