MA S834 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by H4606

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 33-5)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-02-06 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4606
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation relative to female genital mutilation. The Judiciary.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to female genital mutilation

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-06HouseAccompanied a new draft, see H4606
2019-09-17JointHearing scheduled for 09/24/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1
2019-01-22HouseHouse concurred
2019-01-22SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on The Judiciary

Same As/Similar To

H3332 (Similar To) 2020-02-06 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4606
H1466 (Similar To) 2020-02-06 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4606
H4606 (Replaced by) 2020-08-06 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 149 of the Acts of 2020

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback