MA S831 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by S2313

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-03-01 - Accompanied a study order, see S2313
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to promote homelessness prevention in Massachusetts. The Judiciary.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Promoting homelessness prevention in Massachusetts

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-01SenateAccompanied a study order, see S2313
2017-09-19JointHearing scheduled for 09/26/2017 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-2
2017-01-23HouseHouse concurred
2017-01-23SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on The Judiciary

Same As/Similar To

S999 (Similar To) 2018-03-09 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2327
S852 (Similar To) 2017-10-02 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2170
S1256 (Similar To) 2018-07-12 - Read and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1287 (Similar To) 2018-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2292
S1378 (Similar To) 2018-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2292
H2445 (Similar To) 2018-07-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H4682
S332 (Similar To) 2018-03-19 - Accompanied a study order, see S2350
H220 (Similar To) 2018-05-21 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
S2061 (Similar To) 2017-05-03 - Placed on file
H659 (Similar To) 2018-01-31 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H1135 (Similar To) 2018-06-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4625
H3904 (Similar To) 2018-07-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4721
S2313 (Replaced by) 2018-03-29 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
S2546 (Similar To) 2018-06-21 - Reprinted as amended, see S2574
S2568 (Similar To) 2018-07-02 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S2574 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H4725 (Similar To) 2018-07-11 - Published as amended, see H4742

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback