MA S798 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-01-22 - House concurred
Pending: Joint Housing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation relative to credit building. Housing.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to credit building

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-01-22HouseHouse concurred
2019-01-22SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Housing

Same As/Similar To

H2499 (Similar To) 2019-01-22 - Senate concurred
H2397 (Similar To) 2019-01-22 - Senate concurred
H1122 (Similar To) 2019-01-22 - Senate concurred
S1761 (Similar To) 2019-06-07 - Hearing scheduled for 06/11/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in B-2
S637 (Similar To) 2019-01-22 - House concurred
H2627 (Similar To) 2019-06-07 - Hearing scheduled for 06/11/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in B-2
H3696 (Similar To) 2019-06-20 - Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback