MA S749 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2541
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2541
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2541
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to establish a special commission to evaluate the original infrastructure debt at the University of Massachusetts Boston. Higher Education.
Title
Resolve to establish a special commission to evaluate the original infrastructure debt at the University of Massachusetts Boston
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-18 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2541 |
2019-05-23 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/11/2019 from 10:30 AM-01:30 PM in A-1 |
2019-01-22 | House | House concurred |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Higher Education |
Same As/Similar To
H729 (Similar To) 2020-02-05 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
S324 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2538
H2478 (Similar To) 2020-11-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5128
S1055 (Similar To) 2019-04-29 - Bill reported favorably by committee as changed and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H43 (Similar To) 2020-12-23 - Accompanied a study order, see H5209
H1262 (Similar To) 2020-09-28 - Accompanied a study order, see H4974
S1689 (Similar To) 2020-10-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H5040
H474 (Similar To) 2020-07-28 - Committee recommended ought to pass and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H560 (Similar To) 2020-12-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5159
S2052 (Similar To) 2020-04-27 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
S2541 (Replaced by) 2020-02-20 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
S324 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2538
H2478 (Similar To) 2020-11-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5128
S1055 (Similar To) 2019-04-29 - Bill reported favorably by committee as changed and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H43 (Similar To) 2020-12-23 - Accompanied a study order, see H5209
H1262 (Similar To) 2020-09-28 - Accompanied a study order, see H4974
S1689 (Similar To) 2020-10-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H5040
H474 (Similar To) 2020-07-28 - Committee recommended ought to pass and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H560 (Similar To) 2020-12-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5159
S2052 (Similar To) 2020-04-27 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
S2541 (Replaced by) 2020-02-20 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S749 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S749.pdf |