MA S738 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2727
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-01 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2727
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-01 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2727
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to ensure students' access to academic transcripts. Higher Education.
Title
Ensuring students' access to academic transcripts
Sponsors
Sen. Harriette Chandler [D] | Rep. David LeBoeuf [D] | Rep. Rady Mom [D] | Sen. Eric Lesser [D] |
Rep. Patrick Kearney [D] | Rep. Kathleen LaNatra [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-01 | Senate | Accompanied a new draft, see S2727 |
2019-05-02 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 05/13/2019 from 10:30 AM-01:30 PM in A-1 |
2019-01-22 | House | House concurred |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Higher Education |
Same As/Similar To
S747 (Similar To) 2020-03-05 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2580
H1230 (Similar To) 2020-12-23 - Accompanied a study order, see H5209
H3273 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
H1226 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4424
H3756 (Similar To) 2020-12-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5159
S2727 (Replaced by) 2020-06-01 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H1230 (Similar To) 2020-12-23 - Accompanied a study order, see H5209
H3273 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
H1226 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4424
H3756 (Similar To) 2020-12-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5159
S2727 (Replaced by) 2020-06-01 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S738 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S738.pdf |