MA H3756 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H5159
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 32-2-1)
Status: Introduced on May 13 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-12-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5159
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 13 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-12-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5159
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to career technical education schools and programs. Education.
Title
To increase student access to career technical education schools and programs which are aligned with regional labor market needs
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-03 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H5159 |
2019-06-13 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/24/2019 from 10:00 AM-05:00 PM in A-1 |
2019-05-13 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-05-13 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Education |
Same As/Similar To
S738 (Similar To) 2020-06-01 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2727
H1226 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4424
H5159 (Replaced by) 2020-12-03 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H1226 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4424
H5159 (Replaced by) 2020-12-03 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H3756 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H3756.pdf |