MA S72 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by S2345

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-03-19 - Accompanied a study order, see S2345
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to further reduce EBT fraud. Children, Families and Persons with Disabilities.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To further reduce EBT fraud

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-19SenateAccompanied a study order, see S2345
2017-05-08JointHearing scheduled for 05/16/2017 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in B-2
2017-01-23HouseHouse concurred
2017-01-23SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Children, Families and Persons with Disabilities

Same As/Similar To

S71 (Similar To) 2018-03-19 - Accompanied a study order, see S2345
S1215 (Similar To) 2018-05-21 - Committee recommended ought to pass and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1666 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2497
S424 (Similar To) 2018-02-15 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4234
H1602 (Similar To) 2017-05-10 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H605 (Similar To) 2018-05-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4528
H1538 (Similar To) 2018-02-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4244
H1577 (Similar To) 2018-02-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4244
H2620 (Similar To) 2018-02-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4244
H3234 (Similar To) 2018-06-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4625
S2345 (Replaced by) 2018-04-11 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback