MA H1577 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4244
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4244
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4244
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to reducing the income tax to five percent. Revenue.
Title
Relative to reducing the income tax to 5%
Sponsors
Rep. Marc Lombardo [R] | Rep. Shaunna O'Connell [R] | Rep. Joseph McKenna [R] | Rep. James Lyons [R] |
Rep. James Dwyer [D] | Sen. Bruce Tarr [R] | Rep. Kevin Kuros [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-22 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4244 |
2017-05-26 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/11/2017 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-2 |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2017-01-23 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Revenue |
Same As/Similar To
S1666 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2497
H1642 (Similar To) 2018-02-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4244
S1499 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2497
S1642 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2497
S1653 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2497
H1574 (Similar To) 2018-02-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4244
H1480 (Similar To) 2018-02-12 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4214
H1569 (Similar To) 2018-02-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4244
H4244 (Replaced by) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H1642 (Similar To) 2018-02-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4244
S1499 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2497
S1642 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2497
S1653 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2497
H1574 (Similar To) 2018-02-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4244
H1480 (Similar To) 2018-02-12 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4214
H1569 (Similar To) 2018-02-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4244
H4244 (Replaced by) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H1577 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H1577.pdf |