MA H2620 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4244
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4244
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4244
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to reduce the sales tax to five percent. Revenue.
Title
Relative to rolling back the sales tax
Sponsors
Rep. James Lyons [R] | Rep. Shaunna O'Connell [R] | Rep. Leonard Mirra [R] | Rep. Shawn Dooley [R] |
Rep. Kevin Kuros [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-22 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4244 |
2017-10-24 | Joint | Hearing canceled – new hearing TBD |
2017-10-20 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/31/2017 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-1 |
2017-09-20 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/31/2017 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-1 |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2017-01-23 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Revenue |
Same As/Similar To
H1612 (Similar To) 2018-02-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4244
H1484 (Similar To) 2018-02-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4244
H1498 (Similar To) 2017-05-04 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3664
H1558 (Similar To) 2017-05-04 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3666
H3316 (Similar To) 2018-02-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4244
H4114 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H4244 (Replaced by) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H1484 (Similar To) 2018-02-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4244
H1498 (Similar To) 2017-05-04 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3664
H1558 (Similar To) 2017-05-04 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3666
H3316 (Similar To) 2018-02-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4244
H4114 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H4244 (Replaced by) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H2620 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H2620.pdf |