MA S717 | 2009-2010 | 186th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2379
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-01-04 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-01-04 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Expidite appeals of wage violations
Title
Expediting appeals of wage violations.
Sponsors
Rep. Christine Canavan [D] | Rep. Paul McMurtry [D] | Sen. Marc Pacheco [D] | Rep. David Sullivan [D] |
Sen. James Timilty [D] | Rep. Martin Walsh [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-01-04 | No further action taken | |
2010-05-24 | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Committee on Ways and Means | |
2010-04-20 | Recommitted to the committee on Joint Committee on Labor and Workforce Development | |
2010-04-13 | Accompanied a study order, see S2379 | |
2009-01-20 | House concurred | |
2009-01-20 | Referred to the committee on Joint Committee on Labor and Workforce Development |
Same As/Similar To
S2379 (Replaced by) 2010-04-20 - Reported (in part) by S00717
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/186/Senate/S717 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/PDF?billId=3374&generalCourtId=2 |