MA S715 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-14 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing
Pending: Joint Health Care Financing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-14 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing
Pending: Joint Health Care Financing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to ensure access to prescription medications. Financial Services.
Title
To ensure access to prescription medications
Sponsors
Sen. Bruce Tarr [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-14 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing |
2023-04-28 | Joint | Hearing rescheduled to 05/02/2023 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium |
2023-04-18 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 05/02/2023 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A2 and virtual |
2023-02-16 | House | House concurred |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Financial Services |
Same As/Similar To
S670 (Similar To) 2024-03-11 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing
S1369 (Similar To) 2024-02-15 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing
S2492 (Similar To) 2023-11-15 - Read second
S2499 (Similar To) 2023-11-15 - Bills in the Third Reading report, substituting a new draft S2520, accepted
S2520 (Similar To) 2023-11-20 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S1369 (Similar To) 2024-02-15 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing
S2492 (Similar To) 2023-11-15 - Read second
S2499 (Similar To) 2023-11-15 - Bills in the Third Reading report, substituting a new draft S2520, accepted
S2520 (Similar To) 2023-11-20 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/S715 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/S715.pdf |