MA S2492 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court

Note: Replaces legislation S732
Note: Legislation replaced by S2499

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 28-9-1-1)
Status: Introduced on October 30 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-11-15 - Read second
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislationfor legislationfor legislationfor legislationfor legislationfor legislationfor legislation to bring down the cost of prescription drugs; of Nicholas A. Boldyga relative to establishing a prescription drug rebate program for seniors; of Edward F. Coppinger and others relative to promoting comprehensive transparency in the pharmaceutical industry; of Kate Hogan relative to the pricing of prescription drugs; of Bradley H. Jones, Jr., and others that the Health Policy Commission and health insurers create listings of certain high cost prescription drugs and that the Attorney General require drug manufacturers to provide information to justify increases in costs; of Bradley H. Jones, Jr., and others for an investigation by a special commission (including members of the General Court) relative to contracts between the MassHealth program and pharmaceutical benefit managers; of John J. Lawn, Jr., and others relative to pharmacy benefit managers; of William M. Straus relative to drug prices paid by carriers; and of Alyson M. Sullivan-Almeida, Michael J. Soter and David F. DeCoste relative to pharmacy benefit managers reimbursements to pharmacies in the Commonwealth, reports the accompanying bill (Senate, No. 2492).

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to pharmaceutical access, costs and transparency

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-11-15SenateRead second
2023-11-09SenatePlaced in the Orders of the Day for Wednesday, November 15, 2023
2023-11-09SenateOrder relative to subject matter adopted
2023-11-09SenateCommittee recommended ought to pass with an amendment, substituting a new draft, see S2499
2023-10-30SenateBill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
2023-10-30SenateNew draft of S732, S749, S767, S778, S783, S784, S797, H619, H1176, H1201, H1205, H1206, H1215, H1246 and H1247
2023-10-30SenateReported from the committee on Health Care Financing

Same As/Similar To

S732 (Replaces) 2023-10-30 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2492
S2499 (Replaced by) 2023-11-15 - Bills in the Third Reading report, substituting a new draft S2520, accepted
S2520 (Similar To) 2023-11-20 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S749 (Similar To) 2023-10-30 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2492

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback