MA S675 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-11-09 - Accompanying S1276
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-11-09 - Accompanying S1276
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to mental health parity implementation. Financial Services.
Title
Relative to mental health parity implementation
Sponsors
Sen. Cindy Friedman [D] | Sen. Julian Cyr [D] | Rep. Susannah Whipps Lee [I] | Sen. Salvatore DiDomenico [D] |
Sen. Joanne Comerford [D] | Sen. John Keenan [D] | Rep. Natalie Higgins [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-11-09 | Senate | Accompanying S1276 |
2021-11-08 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2021-10-14 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2021-10-12 | House | Discharged to the Joint Committee on Mental Health, Substance Use and Recovery |
2021-07-15 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/27/2021 from 11:00 AM-03:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | House | House concurred |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Financial Services |
Same As/Similar To
H1041 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S1720 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2679
S1288 (Similar To) 2021-11-09 - Accompanying S1276
S2514 (Similar To) 2021-09-13 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2528
S2528 (Similar To) 2021-09-13 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H1038 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H1461 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4844
S1010 (Similar To) 2022-09-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H5225
S1290 (Similar To) 2022-09-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H5229
S1610 (Similar To) 2022-03-21 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1284 (Similar To) 2022-07-11 - Committee recommended ought to pass and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2584 (Similar To) 2022-08-01 - Reported by S3097
H4879 (Similar To) 2022-06-16 - Published as amended, see H4891
S1276 (Similar To) 2021-11-17 - New draft substituted, see S2572
S1720 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2679
S1288 (Similar To) 2021-11-09 - Accompanying S1276
S2514 (Similar To) 2021-09-13 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2528
S2528 (Similar To) 2021-09-13 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H1038 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H1461 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4844
S1010 (Similar To) 2022-09-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H5225
S1290 (Similar To) 2022-09-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H5229
S1610 (Similar To) 2022-03-21 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1284 (Similar To) 2022-07-11 - Committee recommended ought to pass and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2584 (Similar To) 2022-08-01 - Reported by S3097
H4879 (Similar To) 2022-06-16 - Published as amended, see H4891
S1276 (Similar To) 2021-11-17 - New draft substituted, see S2572
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S675 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S675.pdf |