MA S663 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2858
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-02 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2858
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-02 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2858
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to fairness in debt collection. Financial Services.
Title
Relative to fairness in debt collection
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-02 | Senate | Accompanied a new draft, see S2858 |
2022-04-21 | House | House concurred |
2022-03-24 | Senate | Reporting date extended to Saturday April 30, 2022, pending concurrence |
2021-10-13 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/26/2021 from 11:00 AM-03:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | House | House concurred |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Financial Services |
Same As/Similar To
H1168 (Similar To) 2022-05-09 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4749
S224 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2858 (Replaced by) 2022-05-02 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H4749 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S224 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2858 (Replaced by) 2022-05-02 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H4749 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S663 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S663.pdf |