MA S616 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by S2637

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-14 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2637
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation relative to patient cost, benefit and coverage information, choice, and price transparency. Financial Services.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to patient cost, benefit and coverage information, choice, and price transparency

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2024-03-14SenateAccompanied a new draft, see S2637
2023-05-02JointHearing scheduled for 05/16/2023 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2 and virtual
2023-02-16HouseHouse concurred
2023-02-16SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Financial Services

Same As/Similar To

S2637 (Replaced by) 2024-05-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4634
H4643 (Similar To) 2024-05-16 - Published as amended, see H4653

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback