MA S2637 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court

Note: Replaces legislation S616
Note: Legislation replaced by H4634

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 12 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-05-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4634
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation relative to patient cost, benefit and coverage information, choice, and price transparency, report the accompanying bill (Senate, No. 2637).

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to patient cost, benefit and coverage information, choice, and price transparency

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2024-05-09HouseAccompanied a study order, see H4634
2024-03-14SenateBill reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing
2024-03-14SenateNew draft of S616
2024-03-12SenateReported from the committee on Financial Services

Same As/Similar To

S616 (Replaces) 2024-03-14 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2637
H4634 (Replaced by) 2024-12-31 - No further action taken

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback